judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER WARDELL JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0241)
Case Number:S-10-0241Case Docketed On:11/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER WARDELL JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER WARDELL JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChrisopher Wardell JonesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Jessica Y. Frint
Stewart Michael Young

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 115
Citation:256 P.3d 536

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/20/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/11/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/11/2011Motion - ReinstatementMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
02/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Verified Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and Reinstate AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/14/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from Ms. Kerin indicating that she had spoken with Mr. Pauling and the attorney general's office will not respond to the motion for reinstatement and has no objection.EventPhone CallFinal
02/23/2011Order - Reinstatement of AppealOrderReinstatementFinal
02/23/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Jessica Frint, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
04/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica Frint, Student Director PAP, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/02/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/26/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, and Jessica Y. Frint, Student Director, PAP, argument by Ms. Frint for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/26/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/03/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/19/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/19/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/23/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/22/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal