judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JOHNSON TESTERS, A DIVISION OF SCHLUMBERGER WELL SURVEYING CORPORATION v. JOSE RANGEL

Case: B-1367
B-1367
02/11/1969
Application for Writ of Error
JOHNSON TESTERS, A DIVISION OF SCHLUMBERGER WELL SURVEYING CORPORATION
JOSE RANGEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/25/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/05/1969Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/14/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/13/1969Errata FiledPetitioner
03/06/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/30/1969Response to Motion filed
06/25/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/05/1969Supplemental Brief filed
03/14/1969Reply to Response
03/13/1969Errata Filed
03/06/1969Response to Petition
02/11/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/11/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jose RangelRespondent
Johnson Testers, a Division of Schlumberger Well Surveying CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information