judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4002
B-4002
05/09/1973
Application for Writ of Error
DR. JACK BURTON, ET AL.
DR. N. JAY ROGERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/14/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/06/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/29/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/09/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/16/1974Response to Motion filed
01/14/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/31/1973Dissenting opinion issued.
12/31/1973Opinion issued
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
07/06/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/29/1973Response to Petition
05/09/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/09/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Optometric AssociationAmicus Curiae
Dr. N. Jay RogersRespondent
Dr. Jack Burton, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information