judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IMPERIAL PALACE VS. SMITH

Case Information: 34872
Short Caption:IMPERIAL PALACE VS. SMITHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A354165Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Barker Brown Busby Crisman & Thomas--check no. 1503.
09/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09051
09/28/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of entry of 6/15/99 order. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: June 23, 1999. 99-09604
12/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-12295
01/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-00643
02/17/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-02550
03/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-03507
03/06/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.