judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN H. SELF v. DAVE KINSKEY, STUART HEALY, KATHY KENNEDY, and MIKE CARD

Case Heading (S-08-0236)
Case Number:S-08-0236Case Docketed On:10/29/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15)
Short Title:JOHN H. SELF v. DAVE KINSKEY, STUART HEALY, KATHY KENNEDY, and MIKE CARD
Full Title:JOHN H. SELF, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAVE KINSKEY, STUART HEALY, KATHY KENNEDY, and MIKE CARD, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn H. Self Pro Se
AppelleeDave KinskeyClint Andrew Langer
AppelleeStuart S. HealyClint Andrew Langer
AppelleeKathy KennedyClint Andrew Langer
AppelleeMike CardClint Andrew Langer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/29/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/29/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - filed per Chief Justice, no action necessary.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/18/2008Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - untitled pleading, treated as petiton for instatementNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/21/2009Order - Denying reinstatement of appealOrderDenyFinal
01/21/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal