judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MAXWELL BURKET, ET AL. v. JULIUS GROSSENBACHER, JR., TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE OF LILLIAN BELL, N.C.M.

Case: B-1353
B-1353
01/29/1969
Application for Writ of Error
MAXWELL BURKET, ET AL.
JULIUS GROSSENBACHER, JR., TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OF THE ESTATE OF LILLIAN BELL, N.C.M.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/24/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/19/1969Letter brief Petitioner
07/02/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/10/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/14/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/29/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/08/1969Letter Filed
10/13/1969Response to Motion filed
10/09/1969Letter Filed
10/09/1969Letter Filed
10/08/1969Letter Filed
09/24/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/16/1969Letter Filed
08/19/1969Letter brief
07/15/1969Response to Motion filed
07/02/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/10/1969Reply to Response
02/14/1969Response to Petition
01/29/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/29/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Maxwell Burket, et al.Petitioner
Julius Grossenbacher, Jr., Temporary Guardian of the Estate of Lillian Bell, N.C.M.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information