judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4010
B-4010
05/11/1973
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT S. CALVERT, ET AL.
ZANES-EWALT WAREHOUSE, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1974Notice of Appeal filedRespondent
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/06/1973Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/01/1973Post submission brief filedPetitioner
10/24/1973Letter brief Petitioner
10/15/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/20/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/21/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/11/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/17/1974Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
02/07/1974Notice of Appeal filed
12/27/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/12/1973Opinion issued
11/06/1973Response to Brief filed
11/01/1973Post submission brief filed
10/24/1973Letter brief
10/15/1973Supplemental Brief filed
07/25/1973Document received (See Remarks)
06/25/1973Response to Motion filed
06/20/1973Motion for RehearingFiling granted
05/21/1973Response to Petition
05/11/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, et al.Petitioner
Zanes-Ewalt Warehouse, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information