judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3980
B-3980
04/30/1973
Application for Writ of Error
AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY
RICHARD CURTIS HUGHES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/12/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/16/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
04/30/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/03/1973Letter Filed
07/12/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/27/1973Opinion issued
06/27/1973Document received (See Remarks)
06/18/1973Response to Motion filed
05/30/1973Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filedFiling granted
05/16/1973Response to Petition
04/30/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/30/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richard Curtis HughesRespondent
Aetna Casualty and Surety CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information