judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DALE WAYNE EATON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0235)
Case Number:S-08-0235Case Docketed On:10/24/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:DALE WAYNE EATON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DALE WAYNE EATON, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerDale Wayne EatonDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2008 WY 133; 2009 WY 36; 2009 WY 145
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/24/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/24/2008Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
10/24/2008Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
10/24/2008Motion - Stay of ExecutionMotionStay - otherFinal
11/05/2008Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/05/2008Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
11/06/2008Response/Objection - Other - Petitioner's reply to response to petitioner's motion for stay of execution.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
11/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received response to petition for writ of refview or writ of certiorari and motion for amended warrant for executionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received response to petitioner's motion for stay of executionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received petitioner's reply to response to petitioner's motion for stay of executionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Opinion - Published Order - Granting Petition for Writ of Review, Order Vacating Warrant of Execution, Order Setting Date of Execution and Order Staying ExecutionOrderGrantFinal
11/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Other - sent copy of Order of 11/14/08 to United States Supreme Court death penalty clerk.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
12/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
12/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's Status Report (No action necessary)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
02/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's status reportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2009Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for writ of certiorari denied.Notice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
03/11/2009Opinion - Published order Continuing Stay of Execution Pending Disposition of State Post-Conviction Relief ProceedingOpinionPublished orderFinal
05/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
05/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's Status ReportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - other - State Post-convictionNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
11/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Defendant's Opposition to State's Motion to Issue Warrant of Execution filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's status reportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
11/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's status reportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2009Order - Lifting Stay of Execution and Closing CaseOrderLifting StayFinal
11/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal