judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4006
B-4006
05/10/1973
Application for Writ of Error
MARKETERS INTERNATIONAL, INC., GEORGE LEVIT AND W. V. WOMACK, JR.
E.F.I., INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1974Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/28/1974Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/18/1974Response to Reply filedRespondent
03/13/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/20/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/04/1973Response to Reply filedRespondent
05/23/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/17/1973Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/16/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1974Response to Brief filed
03/28/1974Supplement to Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/18/1974Response to Reply filed
03/13/1974Reply to Response
03/07/1974Response to Motion filed
02/20/1974Motion for Rehearing
02/06/1974Opinion issued
06/04/1973Response to Reply filed
05/23/1973Reply to Response
05/17/1973Supplement to Response
05/16/1973Response to Petition
05/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E.F.I., Inc.Respondent
Marketers International, Inc., George Levit and W. V. Womack, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information