judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MERCADO-LEAL (FRANCISCO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34865
Short Caption:MERCADO-LEAL (FRANCISCO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46323
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR95P2729Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/22/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09039
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10291
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11287
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/24/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 1999. 99-11287