judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAWN FOWLER-CLEMONS V. AUSTINE FOWLER

Case Information: 10-CV-1413
Short Caption:DAWN FOWLER-CLEMONS V. AUSTINE FOWLERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR6232-09Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/26/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDawn Fowler-Clemons NPro SeN
AppelleeAustine Fowler N
Nathan I. FinkelsteinNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 5, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
11/24/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
12/09/2010RECORD INDEX
12/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix
01/07/2011APPENDIX
02/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/04/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appendix
05/04/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. The trial court properly entered summary judgment where appellants did not present any evidence disputing appellee's right to an ownership interest in the subject property... SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
05/04/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
05/26/2011MANDATE ISSUED