judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK ROCKY HERNANDEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0229)
Case Number:S-08-0229Case Docketed On:10/20/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:MARK ROCKY HERNANDEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARK ROCKY HERNANDEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark Rocky Hernandez Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2009 WY 49
Citation:205 P.3d 183

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/20/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/03/2008Brief - Appellant (Appellant's brief indicates that is was signed November 24, the certificate of service page was left blank. Brief was deposited in the mail December 2--posted as certificate of service date)BriefAppellantFinal
01/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/02/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/05/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/08/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/28/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal