judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3904
B-3904
03/15/1973
Application for Writ of Error
J. H. WESTBROOK, ET AL.
ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, GRACE MCCAIN DURRELL AND BERTHA G. UMPLEBY, ET AL., HUNT OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/12/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/25/1973Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/18/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
10/10/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/30/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
03/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/14/1974Motion to Withdraw Filed
12/20/1973Response to Motion filed
12/12/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/28/1973Dissenting opinion issued.
11/28/1973Opinion issued
10/25/1973Response to Brief filed
10/18/1973Post submission brief filed
10/10/1973Brief on the Merits
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
03/30/1973Response to Petition
03/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. H. Westbrook, et al.Petitioner
Hunt Oil CompanyRespondent
Atlantic Richfield Company, Grace McCain Durrell and Bertha G. Umpleby, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information