judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3887
B-3887
03/06/1973
Application for Writ of Error
GENEVA NICHOLS, ET VIR
DR. JACK C. SMITH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/14/1974Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/14/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/27/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/14/1973Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/09/1973Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/09/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/26/1973Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/06/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
04/02/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
03/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1974Response to Motion filed
03/14/1974Brief in Support of Petition
03/14/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1974Opinion issued
12/27/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/14/1973Reply to Response
12/11/1973Response to Motion filed
11/26/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
11/09/1973Brief in Support of Petition
11/09/1973Motion for RehearingFiling granted
07/26/1973Response to Brief filed
07/06/1973Post submission brief filed
04/02/1973Response to Petition
03/16/1973Document received (See Remarks)
03/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John McBrydeAmicus Curiae
Dr. Jack C. SmithRespondent
Geneva Nichols, et virPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information