judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL D. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1419
Short Caption:MICHAEL D. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-8596-09Filed Date:11/09/2010

Opening Event Date:11/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/11/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael D. TaylorY
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ephraim Wernick YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Michael L. Spekter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Michael L. Spekter, Esquire
12/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (143 pgs/Rogers) 6/14/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (256 pgs/McCarn) 6/15/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (211 pgs/Rogers) 6/16/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (214 pgs/McCarn) 6/17/10 proc.
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (147 pgs/Rogers) 6/18/10 proc. w/cd
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (9 pgs/White) 6/21/10 proc.
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/03/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 60 days
06/14/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 31, 2011. (Castillo)
08/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 9/30/11.
09/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until December 7, 2011 (Appellant)
10/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief to 12/7/11.
12/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/07/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
01/11/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/11/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/15/2012FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Thompson,Farrell
06/08/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
07/02/2012FiledMandate