judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY LEE BELDEN v. ROBERT LAMPERT, DIRECTOR, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0239)
Case Number:S-08-0239Case Docketed On:10/30/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:GARY LEE BELDEN v. ROBERT LAMPERT, DIRECTOR, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GARY LEE BELDEN, Petitioner, v. ROBERT LAMPERT, DIRECTOR, WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerGary Lee Belden Pro Se
RespondentRobert O. LampertBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
David L. Delicath
RespondentAttorney General's OfficeBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/30/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/30/2008Petition - Writ - habeas corpusPetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
10/30/2008Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
10/30/2008Motion - Other - requesting permission to file memorandum in support of petition for writ of habeas corpus.MotionOtherFinal
10/30/2008Memorandum - In support of petitionMemorandumIn support of petitionFinal
11/10/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
11/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpusEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/21/2008Response/Objection - Motion - Petitioner response to repondent's motion to dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpus.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/25/2008Order - Petition for review - denying petition for writ of Habeas CorpusOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
11/25/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/16/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - Returned Petition for Review on Petition for Writ of Habeas CorpusCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal