judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUNA (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34875
Short Caption:LUNA (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7441Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09080
10/04/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/2/99, 6/10/99, 6/15/99, 6/16/99, 8/16/99. Court Reporter: Polly Stipke. 99-09514
10/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10207
10/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10208
11/02/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10638
12/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-13205
01/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01155
01/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/31/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 27, 2000. 00-01155