judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE WILLIAM GONZALES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1406
Short Caption:JOSE WILLIAM GONZALES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1845-10Filed Date:11/10/2010

Opening Event Date:11/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/31/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose William Gonzales Y
John L. MachadoYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/12/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) John Machado, Esquire
11/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that John Machado, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to November 12, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (49pgs/Coney) 10/20/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (87pgs/Ronan) 10/29/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES
02/23/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 7, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
03/29/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 23, 2011,which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix w/in 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ETW)
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
04/13/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
04/13/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/03/2011APPENDIX
05/13/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/12/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Ruiz, Nebeker
05/09/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
05/31/2012FiledMandate