judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBBIE HEYWOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0221)
Case Number:S-08-0221Case Docketed On:10/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROBBIE HEYWOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBBIE HEYWOOD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobbie HeywoodDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 70
Citation:208 P.3d 71

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/20/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/20/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/31/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, counsel inadvertently only sent five copiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Original Supreme Court Record 06-150 (five volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda M. Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda J. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court; Justice Kite filed a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Hill joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal