Case Information: 61219 | |||
Short Caption: | MARTIN VS. WINZER CORP. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61741 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1201222 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/10/2012 / Cashill, Wm. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/06/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
07/06/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 12-21174 | |
07/06/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | 12-21186 | |
07/10/2012 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Wm. Patterson Cashill. | 12-21583 | |
07/12/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Story Law Group. Check No. 3060. | ||
08/06/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. (Submitted incorrect document for this case). Correct ECAR to be filed. | ||
08/06/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other Early Case Assessment Report. The premediation conference is continued until September. | 12-24699 | |
08/14/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | 12-25549 | |
11/02/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 12-34745 | |
11/29/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Supplemental ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is is scheduled for December 4, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. Nos. 61219/61741. | 12-37710 | |
12/11/2012 | Motion | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 12-38992 | |
12/13/2012 | Settlement Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal/VoluntarySettlement. Pursuant to appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal, "this appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | 12-39406 | |
12/21/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 61219/61741. | 12-40526 |