judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GALLIMORT (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32349
Short Caption:GALLIMORT (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33289 , 36826 , 49438 , 52778 , 61815 , 67207 , 69569 , 69569-COA , 72826 , 72826-COA , 73037 , 80191
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147074Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/12/2000 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/12/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
06/29/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received proper person Appellant's Opening Brief Points and Authorities in Support of Argument. (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.) RETURNED UNFILED 7/7/98.
07/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. and Designation of Counsel. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this court's order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. 1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court.] 2[On June 29, 1998, appellant submitted a proper person opening brief. We direct the clerk to return unfiled appellant's opening brief. Counsel for appellant will file an opening brief and may reassert any arguments that counsel determines are warranted.]
07/07/1998Other Returned Unfiled Document. Return unfiled with letter: original proper person Appellant's Opening Brief Points and Authorities in Support of Argument.
07/13/1998Other Other. Filed Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). Filed in the district court on May 26, 1998.
07/13/1998Other Other. Received certified copy of district court minutes.
07/23/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received proper person Appellant's ex parte Opening Brief Points and Authorities in Support of Argument. (Received original and one copy). RETURNED UNFILED 10/7/98.
10/07/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Designation of Counsel. We again direct the district court to secure counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 20 days to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 20 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this court's order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. 1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court.] 2[On July 23, 1998, appellant submitted a proper person opening brief. We direct the clerk to return unfiled appellant's opening brief.]
10/07/1998Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned unfiled with letter: original proper person Appellant's ex parte Opening Brief Points and Authorities in Support of Argument.
11/13/1998Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice. Notice of the Court. (Received the original only).
12/21/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certified Copy of Notice of Appointment of Counsel filed in district court on 12/18/98. Jonell Thomas appointed as counsel for appellant.
01/12/1999MotionFiled Motion. Filed Motion for Leave to File Notice of Appearance of Counsel.
01/12/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Appearance of Counsel.
02/04/1999Order/IncomingFiled Order. On January 12, 1999, attorney Thomas filed a Motion for Leave to file a Notice of Appearance. We direct the clerk to file the Notice of Appearance submitted on January 12, 1999. Attorney Thomas shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a docketing statement, a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript and 120 days to file the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall thereafter proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1). 1[On November 13, 1998, appellant submitted a proper person notice to the court requesting the appointment of counsel. We deny appellant's request as moot.]
02/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Jonell Thomas.
02/19/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Mailed on 2/16/99.
02/19/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Pauline May and Maureen Schorn. (Mailed on 2/16/99).
03/18/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/18/98 and 2/25/98. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn.
03/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/10/97, 1/28/98, 2/26/98, 4/16/98. Court Reporter: Pauline C. May.
04/16/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/16/99.
04/16/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.
05/13/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express - No postmark).
05/28/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 5/26/99
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument scheduled for January 10, 2000 at the hour of 10:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B - WM, MS, NB)
12/09/1999MotionFiled Motion.
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Rescheduling. We grant the motion to reschedule oral argument. We vacate the argument currently scheduled for: January 10, 2000, at 10:30 a.m. To be rescheduled: January 12, 2000, at 1:30 p.m., in Las Vegas before the Southern Nevada Panel. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (Called all counsel and read the order.)
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP99B WM/MS/NB
01/12/2000Other Other. Filed in open court as a Supplemental Record. Submitted by Kristen Nelsen, Deputy District Attorney, counsel for State of Nevada.
03/10/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Shearing, J. We agree: Maupin, J., and Becker, J. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No.32. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 01-01673
04/05/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05462
04/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2000. 00-05462
11/14/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original and two copies of the Opening Brief with letter.