judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OSORI DIAZ V UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1405
Short Caption:OSORI DIAZ V UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD13116-10Filed Date:11/10/2010

Opening Event Date:11/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOsori Diaz Y
Joseph A. VirgilioYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Joseph Virgilio, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/22/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Joseph Virigilio, Esquire
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (84pgs/Tape) 11/5/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/11/2011error
02/11/2011error
02/11/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) w/anders brief and appendix Granted
02/17/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL, NO LATER THAN MARCH 9, 2011 FILE A RESPONSE showing with specificity any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW is hereby HELD IN ABEYANCE...SEE HARDCOPY (BY: ETW)
02/17/2011TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
04/13/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW pursuant to ANDERS v. CALIFORNIA... IS GRANTED. The government presented sufficient evidence supporting the conviction for violation of the Bail Reform Act...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
04/13/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and IS AFFIRMED. (GLPRFE)
05/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED