judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2408
A-2408
10/25/1949
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
PATSY WILLIAMS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/03/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/06/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/12/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
11/02/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/25/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/03/1950Motion for Rehearing
02/27/1950Letter Filed
02/15/1950Opinion issued
01/06/1950Brief on the Merits
11/30/1949Document received (See Remarks)
11/12/1949Response to Petition
11/04/1949Letter Filed
11/02/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/25/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/25/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Patsy WilliamsRespondent
American General Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Vinson, Elkins, Weems and FrancisAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information