judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2405
A-2405
10/21/1949
Application for Writ of Error
CURTIS F. CORZELIUS
ANN YATES OLIVER AND ROBERT H. OLIVER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/12/1949Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/09/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/31/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
10/21/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/12/1949Response to Brief filed
11/09/1949Brief on the Merits
11/04/1949Additional Copies received
10/31/1949Response to Petition
10/21/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/21/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ann Yates Oliver and Robert H. OliverRespondent
Curtis F. CorzeliusPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information