judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1002
B-1002
07/08/1968
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
BENNY NICHOLS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/12/1968Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/29/1968Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/24/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
07/08/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/11/1968Opinion issued
11/12/1968Supplemental Brief filed
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
10/02/1968Document received (See Remarks)
07/29/1968Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/24/1968Response to Petition
07/08/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/08/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. B. CousinsAmicus Curiae
Houston Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Benny NicholsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information