judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1006
B-1006
07/10/1968
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON ENDOWMENT, INC.
CITY OF HOUSTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/07/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/26/1968Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/08/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
07/10/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/20/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/07/1969Reply to Response
12/31/1968Response to Motion filed
12/26/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/08/1968Response to Petition
07/10/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/10/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Houston, et al.Respondent
Joyce CoxAmicus Curiae
Houston Endowment, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information