judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2399
A-2399
10/17/1949
Application for Writ of Error
B. C. HALLOWAY
GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE FOR SAN ANTONIO, UVALDE AND GULF RAILROAD COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/01/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/05/1950Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/26/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/24/1949Response to PetitionPetitioner
10/17/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/15/1950Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
02/06/1950Supplemental Brief filed
02/01/1950Motion for Rehearing
01/18/1950Opinion issued
01/05/1950Supplemental Brief filed
11/26/1949Brief on the Merits
11/16/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/24/1949Response to Petition
10/17/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/17/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guy A. Thompson, Trustee for San Antonio, Uvalde and Gulf Railroad CompanyRespondent
B. C. HallowayPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information