judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2435
A-2435
11/21/1949
Direct Appeal
M. J. RODRIGUEZ, COUNTY JUDGE, ET AL.
E. G. GONZALES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/30/1950Direct Appeal filed
12/21/1949Brief on the Merits
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/22/1950Opinion issued
01/30/1950Direct Appeal filed
01/17/1950Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
12/21/1949Brief on the Merits
11/21/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M. J. Rodriguez, County Judge, et al.Appellant
E. G. Gonzales, et al.Appellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information