judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KINDRED (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31024
Short Caption:KINDRED (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C122787Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/12/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
09/29/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/02/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin.
10/02/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Laurie Webb.
10/20/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Transcript of Overflow Calendar/Jury Trial dated June 24, 1996 and January 21, 1997. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sharleen Nicholson.
10/28/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which we are unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of this court shall add to the record on appeal copies of any order or other documents received from the clerk of the district court pursuant to this order.
10/29/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 2, 1997; August 28, 1997. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin.
11/13/1997Other Other. Received a certified copy of the Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). Filed in the district court September 17, 1997.
11/17/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 20, 1994; September 29, 1994; January 12, 1995; March 28, 1995; April 4, 1995; September 12, 1995; January 25, 1996; June 20, 1996; June 27, 1996; November 26, 1996; December 12, 1996; January 16, 1997; January 28, 1997; February 4, 1997; March 4, 1997; June 12, 1997; June 13, 1997; June 16, 1997; June 17, 1997; June 18, 1997; July 31, 1997; August 7, 1997; August 8, 1997. Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook; Laurie H. Webb; Roberta Thibideau; Felicia Rene Zabin; Maria C. Wooley; Teresa Lynn DeRossett; Lisa A. Fogleboch; Monika C. Coyle; Marilyn Waggoner; Kristine A. Fluker; Janie L. Olsen; Suzanne M. Furrer.
12/17/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Due Date: 10 days: Fast Track Statement.
01/05/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. From Chief Assistant Clerk of Court: The Notice of Procedural Deficiency was issued in error on 12/17/97. This appeal is not governed by NRAP 3C.
01/09/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Appearance of Counsel.
03/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the required documents or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for Appellant. Required documents: Opening Brief and Appendix.
03/24/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
03/26/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Motion filed March 24, 1998. The Opening Brief shall be served and filed on or before April 24, 1998.
04/24/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/23/98.* *STRICKEN BY ORDER 6/4/98.
05/14/1998MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. STRICKEN BY ORDER 6/4/98.
05/19/1998MotionFiled Motion. To withdraw Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal.
06/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We direct the clerk of this court to strike the Opening Brief filed on April 24, 1998. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file an Opening Brief and an Appendix. Failure to submit the required documents in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. We grant Respondent's motion to withdraw its motion to dismiss this appeal. The clerk shall strike the motion filed on May 14, 1998. Respondent shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve the Answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceeed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[Respondent's request for an extension of time until June 17, 1998, is denied as moot.] (Appellant's Opening Brief filed April 24, 1998, and Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed May 14, 1998 - STRICKEN.)
06/19/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Amended Opening Brief.
06/26/1998BriefReceived Opening Brief. Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 6/25/98. *RETURNED UNFILED 8/21/98.
07/29/1998BriefReceived Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief.* Mailed on: Express - No Postmark. *RETURNED UNFILED 3/3/99.
08/21/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We direct the clerk to return, unfiled, the Amended Opening Brief provisionally submitted on June 26, 1998. Attorney Lamond Mills shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file an Amended Opening Brief and Appendix. fn1[Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1).] Failure to submit a satisfactory Amended Opening Brief and Appendix within 10 days may result in the imposition of sanctions. We deny Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the Amended Opening Brief as moot.
08/21/1998Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned unfiled with letter: original and two copies of Appellant's Amended Opening Brief.
09/01/1998BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Second Amended Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 8/31/98)
09/01/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Appendix.
09/29/1998BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express Mail - No postmark).
10/05/1998BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 10/2/98)
03/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the Answering Brief provisionally submitted by Respondent on July 29, 1998. Respondent's Amended Answering Brief, filed on September 29, 1998, shall serve as the Answering Brief in this matter.
03/03/1999Other Other. Returned unfiled with letter: original Respondent's Answering Brief received July 29, 1998.
04/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Submitted date: 4/12/99.
04/12/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the record and briefs this day.
04/12/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. " . . . we reverse the judgment of conviction and remand this case for further proceedings consistent with this order." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 01/23/01 ORDER: VACATED THIS ORDER OF REVERSAL AND REMAND. 00-15820
09/18/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/18/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Express mail--no date. 00-16451
09/28/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d).
01/23/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order Granting Rehearing, Vacating Prior Order, and Affirming. On September 8, 2000, this curt ordered Kindred's conviction reversed and remanded the case for further proceedings. On September 18, 2000, the State petitioned for rehearing, arguing that this court's disposition overlooked or misapprehended material facts in the record. We conclude that Kindred has failed to demonstrate that his counsel was ineffective due to any conflict of interests. We grant rehearing, vacate our prior ordeer of reversal and remand, and " . . . affirm the judgment of conviction." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 01-01503
02/05/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration of Order Granting Rehearing, Vacating Order, and Affirming. Mailed on: 2/2/01. 01-02336
02/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Cristina Hines. 01-03206
02/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01527
02/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2001. 01-01527
06/06/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. We have reviewed the petition and conclude that en banc reconsideration of the panel's decision is not warranted. " . . . we deny the petition." EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB 01-09383
06/28/2001MotionFiled Motion. (no action required). 01-10985