judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUCE GILBERT v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY

Case Heading (S-08-0202)
Case Number:S-08-0202Case Docketed On:09/17/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:BRUCE GILBERT v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY
Full Title:BRUCE GILBERT, Appellant (Petitioner), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBruce GilbertDawn R. Scott
Laurence W. Stinson
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Park County, WyomingJames F. Davis
Bryan A. Skoric

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Planning and Zoning
Opinion Number:2010 WY 68
Citation:232 P.3d 17

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/17/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/04/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Park CountyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/13/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James F. Davis for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
02/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Dawn Rae Scott and Laurence W. Stinson, argument by Ms. Scott for appellant; James F. Davis for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
03/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/11/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/11/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/14/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal