judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2403
A-2403
10/20/1949
Application for Writ of Error
JIM SANDERS, ET AL.
O. Z. HARDER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/23/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/21/1949Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent
12/09/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/02/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/31/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
10/20/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/28/1950Response to Motion filed
02/23/1950Motion for Rehearing
02/08/1950Opinion issued
12/21/1949Amended Response to Petition for Review filed
12/09/1949Brief on the Merits
12/02/1949Brief on the Merits
11/09/1949Document received (See Remarks)
10/31/1949Response to Petition
10/20/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/20/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jim Sanders, et al.Petitioner
O. Z. HarderRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information