judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADOLPHUS (TODD) VS. STATE C/W 34077

Case Information: 31020
Short Caption:ADOLPHUS (TODD) VS. STATE C/W 34077Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:31020*, 34077 Related Case(s): 34077
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C118675Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/05/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
10/07/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 30948, 31005, 31016, 31020, 31052, 31059, 31104, 31110.
02/05/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7.
02/05/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/19/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance. (Received original and two copies-1 copy without supporting documents returned to Appellant Adolphus.) Mailed on: 1/14/99.
04/29/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Consolidation of Appeals. (Received the original and 2 copies-1 returned to Appellant - Nos. 31020 & 34077.)
04/29/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant - Nos. 31020 & 34077.)
05/11/1999BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant.)
10/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB. Nos. 31020, 34077. 00-17987
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18216
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-18216