judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILBUR JOHNSON V. HORNING BROTHERS CORPORATION

Case Information: 10-CV-1368
Short Caption:WILBUR JOHNSON V. HORNING BROTHERS CORPORATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB11612-10Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilbur Johnson YPro SeN
AppelleeHorning Brothers CorporationN
Sheldon P. SchumanNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/18/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED as the case remains pending in the Superior Court. SEE DC CODE 11-721 (2001)... (BY: ETW)
11/18/2010TMC - OTSC
12/14/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken froma NON-FINAL ORDER. See DC Code  11-721 (2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the CLERK SHALL ISSUE the MANDATE FORTHWITH. (RZNBTE) (rm)
12/14/2010DISMISSED
12/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014LodgedArchived