judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. T. CONWAY, ET AL. v. T. W. IRICK, ET AL.

Case: B-1396
B-1396
02/26/1969
Application for Writ of Error
J. T. CONWAY, ET AL.
T. W. IRICK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/05/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/31/1969Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/10/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/07/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/26/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1969Response to Brief filed
10/31/1969Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
07/14/1969Response to Motion filed
07/10/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/07/1969Response to Petition
02/26/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. W. Irick, et al.Respondent
J. T. Conway, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information