judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2424
A-2424
11/04/1949
Application for Writ of Error
JOSEPHINE M. JOHNSON, ET AL.
MARGARET B. MOORE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/03/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/01/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/25/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/23/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/17/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
11/04/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/03/1950Response to Brief filed
02/01/1950Brief in Support of Petition
01/25/1950Motion for Rehearing
11/23/1949Reply to Response
11/17/1949Response to Petition
11/04/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/04/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Margaret B. Moore, et al.Respondent
Josephine M. Johnson, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information