judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2422
A-2422
11/02/1949
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES STASNY, ET AL.
A. C. BURTON COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/05/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/22/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/14/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
11/02/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1950Letter Filed
12/05/1949Motion for Rehearing
11/22/1949Reply to Response
11/14/1949Response to Petition
11/02/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/02/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles Stasny, et al.Petitioner
A. C. Burton Company, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information