judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2436
A-2436
11/22/1949
Application for Writ of Error
NILS SOLGAARD
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/26/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/04/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/24/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/22/1950Supplement to ResponseRespondent
01/25/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
11/22/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/10/1950Letter Filed
04/26/1950Motion for Rehearing
04/12/1950Opinion issued
03/04/1950Response to Brief filed
02/24/1950Response to Brief filed
02/22/1950Supplement to Response
01/25/1950Response to Petition
01/25/1950Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
01/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
11/22/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyRespondent
Nils SolgaardPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information