judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6381
A-6381
05/29/1957
Application for Writ of Error
PERRY BROWN
GULF TELEVISION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/1957Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/27/1957Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/07/1957Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
05/29/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/10/1958Letter Filed
11/06/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
11/06/1957Opinion issued
09/07/1957Brief on the Merits
06/27/1957Response to Brief filed
06/26/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1957Brief in Support of Petition
06/07/1957Motion to dismissOverruled
05/29/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/29/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Perry BrownPetitioner
Gulf Television CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information