judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6340
A-6340
05/06/1957
Application for Writ of Error
NORA M. SELLERS
ANNE CLAIRE HEARD BREIDENBACH AND CLAUDIA HEARD DE OSBORNE AND HUSBAND, RAFAEL DE OSBORNE, PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/13/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/03/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/16/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
05/11/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
05/06/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/13/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/03/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/16/1957Response to Petition
05/15/1957Response to Petition
05/11/1957Response to Petition
05/06/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/06/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stubbeman, et al.Amicus Curiae
Pan American Petroleum CorporationRespondent
Nora M. SellersPetitioner
Anne Claire Heard Breidenbach and Claudia Heard De Osborne and husband, Rafael De OsborneRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information