judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRIMORIS, LLC v. DON HAWKES CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation

Case Heading (S-08-0243)
Case Number:S-08-0243Case Docketed On:11/07/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:PRIMORIS, LLC v. DON HAWKES CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation
Full Title:PRIMORIS, LLC, Appellant (Defendant), v. DON HAWKES CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, Appellee (Defendant)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPrimoris, LLCJessica Rutzick
AppelleeDon Hawkes Construction, Inc.Joseph F. Moore Jr.
Glenn W. Myers
Gregory C. Dyekman
Brian Joseph Hanify

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/07/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Gregory C. Dyekman and Brian J. Hanify for Appellee, Don Hawkes Construction, Inc.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Jessica RutzickNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
12/17/2008Motion - Other - Motion of Appellant's Counsel to withdrawMotionOtherFinal
12/19/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion of appellant's counsel to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension to time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2008Order - Grant - Appellant's Counsel to WithdrawOrderGrantFinal
12/22/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/30/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
02/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to dismiss appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/02/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal