judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BURGER 1300 CONN. AVE., LLC V. BP 1330 CONN. AVE, LLC,ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1423
Short Caption:BURGER 1300 CONN. AVE., LLC V. BP 1330 CONN. AVE, LLC,ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1535-10Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBurger 1300 Connecticut Ave., LLCN
Gary C. AdlerNN
AppellantBurger 1300 Connecticut Ave LLC Rogue StatesN
Gary C. AdlerNN
AppelleeTrt 1300 Connecticut Avenue Owner LLCN
Paul J. KiernanNY
Kristina CrooksNY
AppelleeSteptoe & JohnsonN
Deborah B. BaumNY
Shannen CoffinNN
Andrew J. Sloniewsky NN
AppelleeBp Connecticut Avenue LLCN
Deborah B. BaumNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/23/2010APPEARANCE - of Kristina A. Crooks counsel for aple (TRT 1300 Connecticut Ave)
12/06/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 5, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/08/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED: Gary C. Adler, Esq. Roetzel & Andress, LPA 600 14th Street, NW Suite 400 Washington,DC 20005 202 625-0600
12/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 8/24/10, 10/4/10, 10/5/10, 10/6/10, 10/7/10 & 10/12/10 (elp)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1(43-pgs/tape 8/24/10 proc.)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (315-pgs/davis 10/4-5/10 proc)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (192-pgs/price 10/6/10 proc.)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (81-pgs/price 10/7/10 proc.)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (34-pgs/jeon 10/12/10 p roc.)w/cd
01/06/2011RECORD INDEX
01/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/19/2011APPEARANCE- Shannen W. Coffin on behalf of aple (Steptoe & Johnson)
02/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no op to 3/23/11
02/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before March 23, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 22, 2011 (no oppo)
03/30/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before April 22, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
04/18/2011STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
04/21/2011 On coniseration of the stipulation of dismissal filed by the parties, it is ORDEREd that this appeal is hereby dismissed and each party to bear its own costs. Any fees due to the Court are to be paid by appellant. See D.C. App. R. 13. (b)(2). (ETW) elp
04/21/2011DISMISSED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED