judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZELLIS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34878
Short Caption:ZELLIS (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140164Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/06/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09114
11/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10880
12/06/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 12/02/99. 99-12136
12/06/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07742
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09509
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-09509