judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CURTIS TRUMBULL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0242)
Case Number:S-08-0242Case Docketed On:11/06/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CURTIS TRUMBULL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CURTIS TRUMBULL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCurtis TrumbullDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Evidence, Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 103
Citation:214 P.3d 978

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/22/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and received copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina N. Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Ramsey for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/03/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Tapes; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Pre-sentence Investigation Report.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/04/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal letter from District Court ClerkRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Meri Vania Ramsey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/20/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part and reversed in part, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/08/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/08/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/10/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion and Mandate signed for 9/9/09 by agent for Warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal