judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT A. BARTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1422
Short Caption:ROBERT A. BARTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6280-95Filed Date:11/15/2010

Opening Event Date:11/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/27/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert A. Barton YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Emily C. Scruggs YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/29/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 15, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
02/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/02/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
03/09/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 8, 2011
03/23/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 8, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF second
04/29/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (In Letter format)(Served by: DCCA on 4/29/11)
05/03/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/17/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Robert A. Barton UPS. Canaan P.O. Box 300 Waymart, PA 18472
05/23/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
05/23/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/23/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/23/2011APPENDIX APLE
05/27/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed within 20 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
06/13/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 20 days from this date (Served by: DCCA on 6/13/11).
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/28/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Reply Brief (maxrb pend).
07/20/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's moton to supplement record and appellant's motion for extension of time to file reply breif.
07/20/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
07/20/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (documents in appellee's appendix to the brief)
08/12/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Supplement (Served by: DCCA on 8/12/11). (Appellant)Granted
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/19/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument and for Appointment of Counsel to Argue. (Appellant)
09/21/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to supplement the reply brief
09/21/2011FiledAppellant's supplemental Reply Brief
09/30/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion to present oral argument.
10/27/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Ruiz, King
02/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and King, Senior Judge.)
03/19/2012FiledMandate