judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ELAINE R. COLE v. SIDNEY LEE

Case: B-1344
B-1344
01/23/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ELAINE R. COLE
SIDNEY LEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/24/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/19/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/06/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/23/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/27/1969Response to Motion filed
03/24/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/19/1969Reply to Response
02/06/1969Response to Petition
01/23/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/23/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sidney LeeRespondent
Elaine R. ColePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information