judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6363
A-6363
05/16/1957
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF MENTAL HYGIENE
DALE W. COPUS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1958Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/28/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/15/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
05/16/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/1958Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
03/07/1958Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
02/05/1958Brief in Support of Petition
01/28/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/15/1958Dissenting opinion issued.
01/15/1958Opinion issued
10/15/1957Response to Petition
06/19/1957Document received (See Remarks)
05/17/1957Document received (See Remarks)
05/16/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of California, Department of Mental HygienePetitioner
Dale W. CopusRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information