judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: HOWARD D. DEINER

Case Information: 10-BG-1395
Short Caption:IN RE: HOWARD D. DEINERClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Lead: 11-BG-0853 Consolidated:10-BG-1395
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN495-10Filed Date:11/12/2010

Opening Event Date:11/12/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Joseph N. BowmanNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentHoward D. Deiner N
Daniel S. SchumackNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/12/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of BAr Counsel with certified copies of four orders from the Circuit Court for Arlington County, Virginia of four felony counts of obtaining money by false pretenses. and one misdemenor count of practicing law without a license.
12/08/2010ORDER It appearing that respondent was convicted in the Circuit Court of Arlington County, Virginia, of four counts of obtaining money by false pretenses, in violation of Virginia Code Sec 18-2-178; and one count of practicing law without a license, in violation of Virginia Code Sec 54, 1-3904, and it appearing that the offenses contitutes serious crimes as defined by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (b), it is ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c), that the respondent, Howard D. Deiner, is suspended immediately from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending resolution of this matter, and the Board on Professional Responsibility is directed to institute a formal proceeding to determine the nature of the offenses and whether it involves moral turpitude within the meaning of D.C. Code Sec 11-2503 (a)(2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement based on compliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
02/25/2011REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that the court disbar respondent pursuant to D.C. Code Sec 11-2503(a), based on his conviction of crimes of moral turpitude per se. Respondent's disbarment should be effective immediately upon issuance of the court's order but run, for purposes of reinstatement, from the date he files the affidavit required by D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g).
03/07/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
03/10/2011LETTER from respondent taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility. Respondent has an appeal pending in the Virginia Court of Appeals No. 0424-11-4.
03/17/2011CASE STAYED ORDERED sua sponte that this matter is held in abeyance pending the final disposition of respondent's appeal in the Virginia Court of Appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel and respondent shall advise the court when respondent's appeal has been decided. (ETW)
07/14/2011FiledReport And Recommendation Of The BPR On Referral recommends that the court disbar respondent on consent pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 12 (b), and that it dismiss the pending criminal conviction matter as moot. The period of disbarment should run, for purposes of reinstatement, from the date that respondent files the affidavit required by D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
08/04/2011FiledDisbarred On Consent - ORDERED that the said Howard D. Deiner is hereby disbarred by consent effective forthwith. The effective date of respondent's disbarment shall run, for reinstatement purposes, from the date respondent files his affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 (g). It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel's petition for discipline in BDN: 495-10, based upon respondent's conviction in the Circuit Court for Arlington County, Virginia is hereby dismissed as moot. (BR,TH,TE)
08/25/2011LodgedNotice Received from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
09/01/2011FiledAffidavit (Respondent)
09/28/2011LodgedLetter From Bar Counsel stating that respondent's affidavit does not comply with D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 (g). (Petitioner Bar Counsel)