judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD VASCO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-10-0235)
Case Number:S-10-0235Case Docketed On:11/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Game and Fish (Title 23)
Short Title:RICHARD VASCO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:RICHARD VASCO, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard VascoR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2011 WY 100
Citation:253 P.3d 515 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/01/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/14/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Richard VascoEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/31/2011Brief - Appellee, with statement of costs attached as an appendix.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; received copy of statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/22/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/27/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal