judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOSHORN (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34856
Short Caption:GOSHORN (LAWRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157146Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08927
09/30/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/24/99, 8/16/99. Court Reporter: James A. Hellesco 99-09391
10/18/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10080
10/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10081
10/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10627
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07740
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09508
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-09508